MA S1067 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate marijuana commercialization. Marijuana Policy.
Title
Further regulating marijuana commercialization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-03-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A1 & A2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Marijuana Policy |
Same As/Similar To
S1060 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S1062 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S1061 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S1078 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S1064 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S1069 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S1073 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S1077 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S1065 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
H1050 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H1053 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H3194 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H1057 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H1052 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
S1059 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
H3818 (Similar To) 2017-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2017
H3732 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4585
H2785 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4585
S1062 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S1061 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S1078 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S1064 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S1069 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S1073 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S1077 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S1065 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
H1050 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H1053 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H3194 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H1057 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H1052 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
S1059 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
H3818 (Similar To) 2017-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2017
H3732 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4585
H2785 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4585
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1067 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1067.pdf |