MA S1150 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H1517
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Accompanied H1517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Accompanied H1517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enhance driver impairment prevention. The Judiciary.
Title
To enhance driver impairment prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Accompanied H1517 |
2021-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1924 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H4255 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1517 (Replaced by) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1603 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2766
H1729 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1924 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H4255 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1517 (Replaced by) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1603 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2766
H1729 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1150 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1150.pdf |