MA S1181 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to variances. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to variances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-04 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2019-06-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:30 AM-02:00 PM in 222 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H1798 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1799 (Similar To) 2019-12-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1799 (Similar To) 2019-12-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1181 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1181.pdf |