MA H1799 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to zoning variances. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to variances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-12-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-12-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-12-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-06-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:30 AM-02:00 PM in 222 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H1814 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
H180 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H1784 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
H1798 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1284 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S94 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H187 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5052
S794 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1181 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1765 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
H3883 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3931 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S2369 (Similar To) 2020-03-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H180 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H1784 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
H1798 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1284 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S94 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H187 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5052
S794 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1181 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1765 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
H3883 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3931 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S2369 (Similar To) 2020-03-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1799 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1799.pdf |