MA S1197 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2524
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Marshfield to withdraw from the Metropolitan Area Planning District. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Marshfield to withdraw from the Metropolitan Area Planning District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2524 |
2019-10-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3063 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2524 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2524 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1197 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1197.pdf |