MA S1271 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5225
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect minors from abusive contracts. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
To protect minors from abusive contracts
Sponsors
Sen. John Cronin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5225 |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/16/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S657 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2698
S193 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2569
H1984 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied S1164
S2045 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2205 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H1069 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S632 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S1190 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5225 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S193 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2569
H1984 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied S1164
S2045 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2205 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H1069 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S632 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S1190 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5225 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1271 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1271.pdf |