MA S1305 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2547
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure timely electronic health record interoperability across health systems to protect patient lives. Public Health.
Title
Ensuring timely electronic health record interoperability across health systems to protect patient lives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2547 |
2019-12-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1119 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
S1159 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
S613 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - New draft substituted, see S2935
S2177 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H990 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S497 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S542 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1285 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H947 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2227 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2547 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1159 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
S613 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - New draft substituted, see S2935
S2177 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H990 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S497 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S542 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1285 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H947 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2227 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2547 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1305 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1305.pdf |