MA S1316 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2292
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the sale of firearms. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to the sale of firearms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2292 |
2017-11-20 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2017-11-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-11-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1338 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1339 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1315 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1302 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1320 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1309 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1365 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
H1870 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
S2292 (Replaced by) 2018-03-05 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4402 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4709
S2407 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2536
S1339 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1315 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1302 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1320 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1309 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1365 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
H1870 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
S2292 (Replaced by) 2018-03-05 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4402 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4709
S2407 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2536
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1316 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1316.pdf |