MA S1339 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Charlemont to establish a tax on commercial recreation services. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local approval received]
Title
Authorizing the town of Charlemont to establish a tax on commercial recreation services
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Hinds [D] | Sen. Paul Mark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-06-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-03-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-22 | House | House concurred |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3901 (Similar To) 2022-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 241 of the Acts of 2022
S5 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Amendment again agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #48 and House Roll Call #38 (Yeas 159 to Nays 41)
H3766 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2022
H3767 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2022
H3989 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022
H4008 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 68 of the Acts of 2021
H4049 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4008
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
S2526 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2022
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1915 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1914 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1811 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1932 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
H2815 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2859 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1912 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied S1878
H2921 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1930 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1929 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S1802 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1858 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S1867 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1911 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S1807 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1808 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S954 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
H4866 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Adopted
H5019 (Similar To) 2022-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 190 of the Acts of 2022
H3003 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1975 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S2312 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1860 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S5 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Amendment again agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #48 and House Roll Call #38 (Yeas 159 to Nays 41)
H3766 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2022
H3767 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2022
H3989 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022
H4008 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 68 of the Acts of 2021
H4049 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4008
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
S2526 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2022
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1915 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1914 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1811 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1932 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
H2815 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2859 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1912 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied S1878
H2921 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1930 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1929 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S1802 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1858 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S1867 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1911 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S1807 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1808 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S954 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
H4866 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Adopted
H5019 (Similar To) 2022-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 190 of the Acts of 2022
H3003 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1975 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S2312 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1860 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1339 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1339.pdf |