MA S1914 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5250
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote healthy alternatives to sugary drinks. Revenue.
Title
To promote healthy alternatives to sugary drinks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5250 |
2021-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2972 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
H3901 (Similar To) 2022-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 241 of the Acts of 2022
S5 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Amendment again agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #48 and House Roll Call #38 (Yeas 159 to Nays 41)
H3766 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2022
H3767 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2022
H3989 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022
H4008 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 68 of the Acts of 2021
H4049 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4008
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
S2526 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2022
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1932 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1930 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1911 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S1807 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4866 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Adopted
H5250 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3901 (Similar To) 2022-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 241 of the Acts of 2022
S5 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Amendment again agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #48 and House Roll Call #38 (Yeas 159 to Nays 41)
H3766 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2022
H3767 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2022
H3989 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022
H4008 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 68 of the Acts of 2021
H4049 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4008
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
S2526 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2022
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1932 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1930 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1911 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S1807 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4866 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Adopted
H5250 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1914 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1914.pdf |