MA S1351 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2292
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a commission to study the effectiveness of a drug dealer registry in the Commonwealth. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Creating a commission to study the effectiveness of a drug dealer registry in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2292 |
2017-05-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1173 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H2839 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H1824 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
S2292 (Replaced by) 2018-03-05 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H2839 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H1824 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
S2292 (Replaced by) 2018-03-05 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1351 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1351.pdf |