MA S1390 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2225
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Accompanied H2225
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Accompanied H2225
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to include psychologists in the definition of nursing practice. Public Health.
Title
Relative to facilitating the utilization of psychologists on the health care team
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Accompanied H2225 |
2021-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2282 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
S237 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
H2225 (Replaced by) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S237 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
H2225 (Replaced by) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1390 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1390.pdf |