MA S1412 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2692
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to public safety. Public Health.
Title
Relative to public safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2692 |
2021-06-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S2436 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3868 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5240
H4119 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
H4122 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Adopted
S725 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S1615 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1093 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S1376 (Similar To) 2022-01-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2613
S2692 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4929 (Similar To) 2022-11-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 254 of the Acts of 2022
S2619 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3868 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5240
H4119 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
H4122 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Adopted
S725 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S1615 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1093 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S1376 (Similar To) 2022-01-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2613
S2692 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4929 (Similar To) 2022-11-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 254 of the Acts of 2022
S2619 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1412 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1412.pdf |