MA S1463 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2491
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to civil service reserve lists. Public Service.
Title
Relative to civil service reserve lists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2491 |
2017-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/07/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1389 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2033 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2086 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2154 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2018
H1410 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2552 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3617 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2579 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3938 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2018
H3883 (Similar To) 2017-11-30 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H3864 (Similar To) 2017-12-26 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4047 (Similar To) 2018-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2018
H4146 (Similar To) 2018-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 280 of the Acts of 2018
S2491 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2666 (Similar To) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 360 of the Acts of 2018
S2033 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S2086 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2154 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2018
H1410 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2552 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3617 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2579 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3938 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2018
H3883 (Similar To) 2017-11-30 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H3864 (Similar To) 2017-12-26 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4047 (Similar To) 2018-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2018
H4146 (Similar To) 2018-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 280 of the Acts of 2018
S2491 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2666 (Similar To) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 360 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1463 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1463.pdf |