MA S1518 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2692
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to advance the health of pregnant persons. Public Health.
Title
Advancing the health of pregnant persons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2692 |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S673 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
H4313 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2022
S2692 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S3088 (Similar To) 2022-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2022
S3095 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2638 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S60 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2688
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
H4313 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2022
S2692 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S3088 (Similar To) 2022-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2022
S3095 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2638 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S60 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2688
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1518 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1518.pdf |