MA S1550 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2441
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2441
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2441
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to tax credits for the purchase of certain medical supplies. Revenue.
Title
Relative to tax credits for the purchase of certain medical supplies
Sponsors
Sen. James Timilty [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
Sen. Robert Hedlund [R] | Rep. George Ross [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2441 |
2011-09-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/06/2011 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Revenue. |
2011-01-19 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2441 (Replaced by) 2012-09-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1550 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11001&generalCourtId=1 |