MA S1619 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2434
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve the earned income tax credit for working families. Revenue.
Title
Improving the earned income tax credit for working families
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Accompanied H2434 |
2019-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2397 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
H2456 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1640 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
H2541 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S57 (Similar To) 2020-09-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2450 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H2624 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2629 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H159 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1767 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
S1615 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2418 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H1275 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4942
H2617 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2434 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2456 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1640 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
H2541 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S57 (Similar To) 2020-09-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2450 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H2624 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2629 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H159 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1767 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
S1615 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2418 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H1275 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4942
H2617 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2434 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1619 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1619.pdf |