MA S1678 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2295
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2295
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2295
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission to consider an appropriate tribute to Nelson Mandela in the City of Boston. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To establish a special commission to consider an appropriate tribute to Nelson Mandela in the City of Boston
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | New draft substituted, as amended, see S2295 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Read second |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, May 19, 2016 with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S2295 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2015-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2295 (Replaced by) 2016-05-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1178 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2128
S859 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1677 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
H2850 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1222 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied H2007
S224 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Discharged from a part of S2215 to the committee on Senate Rules
S325 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2344
S626 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S407 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S987 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S2053 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - Ordered to a third reading
S1178 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2128
S859 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1677 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
H2850 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1222 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied H2007
S224 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Discharged from a part of S2215 to the committee on Senate Rules
S325 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2344
S626 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S407 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S987 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S2053 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - Ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1678 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1678.pdf |