MA S1727 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2386
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to human contact with state agencies. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to human contact with state agencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2386 |
2015-05-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/26/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2386 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1729 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1540 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2151
S1720 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1662 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
H2850 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2784 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1729 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1540 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2151
S1720 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1662 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
H2850 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2784 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1727 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1727.pdf |