MA S1738 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a tax credit for the purchase of hearing aids. Revenue.
Title
Establishing a tax credit for the purchase of hearing aids
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-09-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2397 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S1640 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
S1756 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1686 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S540 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S597 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2624 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2629 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S151 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
S1706 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1767 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
H276 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
S1640 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
S1756 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1686 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S540 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S597 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2624 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2629 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S151 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
S1706 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1767 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
H276 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1738 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1738.pdf |