MA S1831 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to solar power in environmental justice and urban communities. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to solar power in environmental justice and urban communities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-04-25 | House | House concurred |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday April 26, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-21 | House | House concurred |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday April 12, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday March 9, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S1613 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2160
S1846 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1615 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2160
S471 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2833 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H2706 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H3396 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
S1846 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1615 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2160
S471 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2833 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H2706 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H3396 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1831 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1831.pdf |