MA S471 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote solar hot water installations. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To promote solar hot water installations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S1831 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1613 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2160
S1615 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2160
H2706 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
S1613 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2160
S1615 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2160
H2706 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S471 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S471.pdf |