MA S1836 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to responsible emergency planning at nuclear power plants. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to responsible emergency planning at nuclear power plants
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] |
Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D] | Rep. Thomas Calter [D] | Rep. William Crocker [R] | Rep. Mike Connolly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2017-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S1250 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1989 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1193 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1373 (Similar To) 2018-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2633
S1367 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S2001 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2077 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1064 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S1837 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1765 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H2502 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H2490 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H2472 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1989 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1193 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1373 (Similar To) 2018-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2633
S1367 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S2001 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2077 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1064 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S1837 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1765 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H2502 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H2490 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H2472 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1836 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1836.pdf |