MA S1851 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2033
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2033
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2033
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Alcohol Beverages Control Commission. [COMMITTEE].
Title
Relative to the Alcohol Beverages Control Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Rodrigues [D] | Sen. Michael Rush [D] | Rep. Steven Walsh [D] | Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] |
Rep. John Rogers [D] | Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Rep. James Cantwell [D] | Rep. David Nangle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-17 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2033 |
2011-05-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2033 (Replaced by) 2011-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2011
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1851 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8331&generalCourtId=1 |