MA S187 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2666
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to cell phone distributers disclosure of RF radiation. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to the safe use of electronic devices by children
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2666 |
2021-09-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3067 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S2496 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4011 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2021
H4012 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2021
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H1074 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S1005 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1737 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H277 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909
S103 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2912
H230 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S1439 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied H2261
S498 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S100 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2627
S966 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2666 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S186 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S2496 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4011 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2021
H4012 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2021
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H1074 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S1005 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1737 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H277 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909
S103 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2912
H230 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S1439 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied H2261
S498 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S100 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2627
S966 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2666 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S186 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S187 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S187.pdf |