MA S197 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2666
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ban the advertisement of alcohol and marijuana on billboards. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Banning the advertisement of alcohol and marijuana on billboards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2666 |
2021-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S231 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S177 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3094
H403 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S2007 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S2666 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S177 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3094
H403 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S2007 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S2666 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S197 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S197.pdf |