MA S1992 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on August 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Milton to establish a special purpose stabilization fund. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Milton to establish a special purpose stabilization fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-12-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2015-09-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-08-10 | House | House concurred |
2015-08-06 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1987 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2016
S1991 (Similar To) 2015-11-09 - New draft substituted, see S2051
S2001 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 102 of the Acts of 2016
S2051 (Similar To) 2016-05-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2016
S2112 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 104 of the Acts of 2016
S1089 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Accompanied H1831
S1064 (Similar To) 2016-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2016
S1582 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1525 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S2052 (Similar To) 2016-01-21 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #215 [YEAS 25 - NAYS 11]
S2368 (Similar To) 2016-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 320 of the Acts of 2016
H3160 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1184 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
S1991 (Similar To) 2015-11-09 - New draft substituted, see S2051
S2001 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 102 of the Acts of 2016
S2051 (Similar To) 2016-05-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2016
S2112 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 104 of the Acts of 2016
S1089 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Accompanied H1831
S1064 (Similar To) 2016-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2016
S1582 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1525 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S2052 (Similar To) 2016-01-21 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #215 [YEAS 25 - NAYS 11]
S2368 (Similar To) 2016-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 320 of the Acts of 2016
H3160 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1184 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1992 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1992.pdf |