MA S2108 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2558
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt all disabled and handicapped drivers in Massachusetts from displaying decals or plates of being disabled. Transportation.
Title
Exempting all disabled and handicapped drivers in Massachusetts from displaying decals or plates of being disabled
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2558 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied S2558 |
2019-12-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/02/2020 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2074 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3042 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3141 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3131 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3017 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3049 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3036 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied H3141
H3183 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2558 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3042 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3141 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3131 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3017 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3049 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3036 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied H3141
H3183 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2558 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2108 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2108.pdf |