MA H3183 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide Red Star/Blue Star license plates to survivors of firefighters and police officers who died in the line of duty. Transportation.
Title
Providing for a special license plate to survivors of firefighters and police officers who have died in the line of duty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-10-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3042 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3003 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H2359 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3128 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2074 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2108 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3049 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2279 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3003 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H2359 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3128 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2074 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2108 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3049 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2279 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3183 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3183.pdf |