MA S2121 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2681
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to properly account of cost of laws. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Properly account of cost of laws
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2681 |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2451 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2875
S1361 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2451
S287 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H1645 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5170
S813 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S2513 (Similar To) 2022-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 234 of the Acts of 2022
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
S2204 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1105 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1932 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1465 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
S1862 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1026 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H3142 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2358 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S961 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1813 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S2420 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2681 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1361 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2451
S287 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H1645 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5170
S813 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S2513 (Similar To) 2022-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 234 of the Acts of 2022
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
S2204 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1105 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1932 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1465 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
S1862 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1026 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H3142 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2358 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S961 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1813 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S2420 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2681 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2121 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2121.pdf |