MA S2159 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the proper disposal of miniatures. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to the proper disposal of miniatures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-08 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-06-15 | House | House concurred |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-02 | House | House concurred |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 01:30 PM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H3345 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3284 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3332 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2149 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3277 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H453 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H458 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H387 (Similar To) 2022-05-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2022
S1913 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H3284 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3332 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2149 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3277 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H453 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H458 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H387 (Similar To) 2022-05-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2022
S1913 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2159 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2159.pdf |