MA S2176 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to veteran access to recreational lands. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to veteran access to recreational lands
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-04 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H725 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2395 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2398 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2401 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2541 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H866 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3237 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H2370 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3214 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H863 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5070
H3246 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S2209 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 17 of the Acts of 2019
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2385 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2395 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2398 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2401 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2541 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H866 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3237 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H2370 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3214 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H863 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5070
H3246 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S2209 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 17 of the Acts of 2019
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2385 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2176 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2176.pdf |