MA S2185 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2231
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2231
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2231
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Wenham to grant a license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Wenham to grant a license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2231 |
2012-04-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/19/2012 from 03:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2012-03-22 | House | House concurred |
2012-03-19 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2231 (Replaced by) 2012-05-31 - New draft substituted, see S2273
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2185 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=116400&generalCourtId=1 |