MA S2264 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2626
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Amended (DiZoglio) by substituting a new draft, see S2626
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Amended (DiZoglio) by substituting a new draft, see S2626
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to amend the North Andover town charter. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
To amend the North Andover town charter
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Amended (DiZoglio) by substituting a new draft, see S2626 |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Read third |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-07-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-06-24 | House | House concurred |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3822 (Similar To) 2019-10-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2019
S2263 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2265 (Similar To) 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 294 of the Acts of 2020
S2262 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2353
S2269 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied S1203
H3954 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H3969 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2020
H3985 (Similar To) 2019-12-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2019
S1203 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - New draft substituted, see S2406
H1818 (Similar To) 2019-09-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2019
S1192 (Similar To) 2019-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2019
H4036 (Similar To) 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 310 of the Acts of 2020
S2406 (Similar To) 2020-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2019
H4222 (Similar To) 2020-08-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2020
S2626 (Replaced by) 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 297 of the Acts of 2020
S2263 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2265 (Similar To) 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 294 of the Acts of 2020
S2262 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2353
S2269 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied S1203
H3954 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H3969 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2020
H3985 (Similar To) 2019-12-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2019
S1203 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - New draft substituted, see S2406
H1818 (Similar To) 2019-09-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2019
S1192 (Similar To) 2019-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2019
H4036 (Similar To) 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 310 of the Acts of 2020
S2406 (Similar To) 2020-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2019
H4222 (Similar To) 2020-08-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2020
S2626 (Replaced by) 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 297 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2264 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2264.pdf |