MA S233 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special legislative commission on young professionals. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Resolve establishing a special legislative commission on young professionals
Sponsors
Sen. James Welch [D] | Sen. Eric Lesser [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-27 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2019-09-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Springfield Technical Community College |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H729 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2478 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1439 (Similar To) 2020-05-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1248 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
H560 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2052 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S43 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2723
H3524 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2478 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1439 (Similar To) 2020-05-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1248 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
H560 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2052 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S43 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2723
H3524 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S233 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S233.pdf |