MA S2435 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Introduced on September 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-05 - Referred in non-concurrence to the committee on the Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-05 - Referred in non-concurrence to the committee on the Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to safety at public events. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to safety at public events
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-05 | House | Referred in non-concurrence to the committee on the Judiciary |
2019-12-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2433 (Similar To) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2843
S2137 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2806
S2098 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2097 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Accompanied S2042
S2137 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2806
S2098 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2097 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Accompanied S2042
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2435 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2435.pdf |