MA S2574 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 311 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 311 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a Parks and Recreation Commission in the town of Templeton. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local approval received]
Title
Creating a Parks and Recreation Commission in the town of Templeton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-20 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 311 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-12-15 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-12-15 | House | Enacted |
2022-12-12 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-11-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-06-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-05-05 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/18/2022 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-11-24 | House | House concurred |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2575 (Similar To) 2022-11-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 258 of the Acts of 2022
S3020 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 183 of the Acts of 2022
H5158 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Text of an amendment, see S3020
S3020 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 183 of the Acts of 2022
H5158 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Text of an amendment, see S3020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2574 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2574.pdf |