MA S2581 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 270 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 270 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the acquisition of easement interests for a pumping station in the city of Easthampton. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the acquisition of easement interests for a pumping station in the city of Easthampton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-11 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 270 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-10-04 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-10-04 | House | Enacted |
2018-10-01 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-09-17 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-09-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-09-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-09-06 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-09-04 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-09-04 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-07-03 | House | House concurred |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1676 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - New draft substituted, see S2576
S2369 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 212 of the Acts of 2018
S2152 (Similar To) 2018-05-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2018
H4268 (Similar To) 2018-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 169 of the Acts of 2018
S2559 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 214 of the Acts of 2018
S2369 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 212 of the Acts of 2018
S2152 (Similar To) 2018-05-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2018
H4268 (Similar To) 2018-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 169 of the Acts of 2018
S2559 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 214 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2581 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2581.pdf |