MA S277 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2341
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2341
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2341
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enhance school district transportation safety. Education.
Title
Enhancing school district transportation safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2341 |
2015-07-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2341 (Replaced by) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S232 (Similar To) 2016-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2134
H404 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4145
S254 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2221
S282 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2340
H85 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1191 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see S2449
S1896 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S327 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S232 (Similar To) 2016-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2134
H404 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4145
S254 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2221
S282 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2340
H85 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1191 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see S2449
S1896 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S327 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2203
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S277 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S277.pdf |