MA S2801 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2823
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2823
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to equity in the cannabis industry
Title
Relative to equity in the cannabis industry
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #146 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Amendment 18 Roll Call #145 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Amendment 21 Roll Call #144 (Y: 8 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Amendment 20 Roll Call #143 (Y: 3 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Amendment 18 Roll Call #145 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Amendment 21 Roll Call #144 (Y: 8 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Amendment 20 Roll Call #143 (Y: 3 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reprinted, as amended, see S2823 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Read third |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Substituted, as amended, for S2660 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #19 (Rodrigues) adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #18 (Tarr) adopted -see Roll Call #145 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #33 (Moran) adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #31 (Tarr) rejected |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #28 (Keenan) rejected |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #27 (O'Connor) adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #26 (Keenan) rejected |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #25 (Keenan) adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #24 (Keenan) rejected |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #23 (Tarr) rejected |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #21 (Tarr) rejected -see Roll Call #144 (Yeas 8 to Nays 31) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #20 (Tarr) rejected -see Roll Call #143 (Yeas 3 to Nays 36) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #15 (Velis) adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #8 (Moore) adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #7 (Moore) adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Jehlen) adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Brownsberger) adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Gomez) adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Gomez) adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2660 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S67 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
S68 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
S72 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
H181 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
H174 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
S2823 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Reported by S3096
S3096 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Signed (in part) by the Governor, Chapter 180 of the Acts of 2022
S2660 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2801
S68 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
S72 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
H181 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
H174 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
S2823 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Reported by S3096
S3096 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Signed (in part) by the Governor, Chapter 180 of the Acts of 2022
S2660 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2801