MA S2855 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2507
Note: Legislation replaced by S3141
Note: Legislation replaced by S3141
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on May 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-17 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S3141
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-17 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S3141
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Wareham to grant 5 additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2855).
Title
Authorizing the town of Wareham to grant 5 additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure | Sen. Marc Pacheco [D] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-17 | Senate | New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S3141 |
2022-11-17 | Senate | Read third |
2022-11-17 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-05-02 | Senate | New draft of S2507 |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2507 (Replaces) 2022-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2855
S2145 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
S1913 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S211 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1885 (Similar To) 2022-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S3141 (Replaced by) 2022-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 319 of the Acts of 2022
H453 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S247 (Similar To) 2022-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2871
S238 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S2488 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
S2145 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
S1913 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S211 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1885 (Similar To) 2022-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S3141 (Replaced by) 2022-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 319 of the Acts of 2022
H453 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S247 (Similar To) 2022-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2871
S238 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S2488 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2855 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2855.pdf |