MA S2872 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2892
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2892
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2892
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Tamerisa Sanchez, an employee of the Department of Developmental Services. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Tamerisa Sanchez, an employee of the Department of Developmental Services
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Lesser [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-10 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2892 |
2020-07-30 | House | House concurred |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2892 (Replaced by) 2020-09-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2872 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2872.pdf |