MA S2892 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2872
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Tamerisa Sanchez, an employee of the Department of Developmental Services, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2892).
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Tamerisa Sanchez, an employee of the Department of Developmental Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-14 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-09-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-09-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-09-08 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-09-03 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-09-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2020-08-10 | Senate | New draft of S2872 |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2872 (Replaces) 2020-08-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2892
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2892 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2892.pdf |