MA S2983 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - New draft (DiDomenico) substituted, see S3175
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - New draft (DiDomenico) substituted, see S3175
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the city of Everett home rule charter. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local approval received]
Title
Relative to the city of Everett home rule charter
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | Senate | New draft (DiDomenico) substituted, see S3175 |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Read third |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-10-24 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-07-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/20/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-07-06 | House | House concurred |
2022-07-05 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S41 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2021
H3707 (Similar To) 2021-05-10 - Accompanied S41
S1719 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied H2732
S831 (Similar To) 2021-10-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2547
S1191 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2817
S3133 (Similar To) 2022-12-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 301 of the Acts of 2022
H5370 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 408 of the Acts of 2022
H3707 (Similar To) 2021-05-10 - Accompanied S41
S1719 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied H2732
S831 (Similar To) 2021-10-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2547
S1191 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2817
S3133 (Similar To) 2022-12-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 301 of the Acts of 2022
H5370 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 408 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2983 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2983.pdf |