MA S303 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2494
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2494
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2494
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the training, assessment, and assignment of qualified school interpreters in educational settings. Education.
Title
Relative to the training, assessment, and assignment of qualified school interpreters in educational settings
Sponsors
Sen. Brendan Crighton [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] |
Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-19 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2494 |
2021-05-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/20/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H552 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3979
S2450 (Similar To) 2021-09-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2021
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S289 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2494 (Replaced by) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3979 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1769 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S316 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1490 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S334 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S296 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
S1657 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5363 (Similar To) 2022-11-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H610 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H621 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5099
S2450 (Similar To) 2021-09-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2021
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S289 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2494 (Replaced by) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3979 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1769 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S316 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1490 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S334 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S296 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
S1657 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5363 (Similar To) 2022-11-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H610 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H621 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5099
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S303 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S303.pdf |