MA S430 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2917
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to develop a statewide master plan to increase the availability of affordable assisted living facilities. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative to affordable assisted living facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2917 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-31 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H3809 (Similar To) 2021-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2021
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
H4201 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S895 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S410 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S868 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S2917 (Replaced by) 2022-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S760 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S905 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
H4201 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S895 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S410 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S868 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S2917 (Replaced by) 2022-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S760 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S905 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S430 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S430.pdf |