MA S443 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2540
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to address noise issues of migratory game hunters near coastal dwellings. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Addressing noise issues of migratory game hunters near coastal dwellings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2540 |
2019-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 12:30 PM-04:00 PM in Division of Fisheries and Wildlife |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H739 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5013
S2540 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2540 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S443 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S443.pdf |