MA S483 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2540
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to encouraging the growth of a healthy forest and wood products sector in Massachusetts. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to encouraging the growth of a healthy forest and wood products sector in Massachusetts
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] | Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D] | Sen. Paul Mark [D] |
Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2540 |
2019-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H2397 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S1640 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
S1756 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1686 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2631 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1761 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4467
S485 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2624 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2629 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S527 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - New draft substituted, see S2520
H3737 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4415
S2540 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1640 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
S1756 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1686 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2631 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1761 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4467
S485 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2624 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2629 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S527 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - New draft substituted, see S2520
H3737 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4415
S2540 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S483 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S483.pdf |