MA S613 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to continue care for families enrolled in MassHealth. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to continuity of care for families enrolled in MassHealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-01 | House | House concurred |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-04-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S648 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S604 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S624 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S606 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
S611 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1095 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2439
S654 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H606 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2988 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H2212 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H623 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H624 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied S1164
H2399 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
S604 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S624 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S606 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
S611 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1095 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2439
S654 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H606 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2988 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H2212 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H623 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H624 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied S1164
H2399 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S613 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S613.pdf |