MA S668 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to support equal access to community care for elders and the disabled. Health Care Financing.
Title
Supporting equal access to community care for elders and the disabled
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-06-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H2395 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H633 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H2401 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H621 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Accompanied S356
S1810 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1261 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3199 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S783 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2529
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2430 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H633 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H2401 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H621 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Accompanied S356
S1810 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1261 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3199 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S783 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2529
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2430 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S668 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S668.pdf |